Aviation West Charters, LLC et al v. Connecticut General Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Aviation West Charters, LLC and Erin Gaal
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00035
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 27, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EAMON P. KELLY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 22, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS, Motions terminated: 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10382357.) filed by Erin Gaal, Aviation West Charters, LLC, 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10381968.) filed by Erin Gaal, Aviation West Charters, LLC.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
March 10, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 14 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
February 19, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviation West Charters, LLC et al v. Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviation West Charters, LLC
Represented By: Carter Wolden
Represented By: Kirk J. Wolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Gaal
Represented By: Carter Wolden
Represented By: Kirk J. Wolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan S. Altura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?