City of Berkeley v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: City of Berkeley
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Solutia, Inc. and Pharmacia Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv00071
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 89 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
February 3, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 71 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
April 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ORDER - DENYING TRANSFER. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Berkeley v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Lynne Sarah Bourgault
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Represented By: John Paul Fiske
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?