Jill Cakebread et al v. Berkeley Millwork and Furniture Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Steve Cakebread and Jill Cakebread
Defendant: Berkeley Millwork and Furniture Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00083
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Attorney Fees. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 13, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting Berkeley Millwork's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying the Cakebreads' 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
December 12, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 49 Allowing Berkeley Millwork to File Amended Answer, Voluntarily Dismiss Counterclaims with Prejudice, and Withdraw Jury Trial Demand. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 21, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 39 Motion for Sanctions. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 24, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deposition and Dispositive Motion Filing Deadlines. Jury Selection set for 5/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Cou rtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/16 (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (cl, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 20, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/20/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
April 7, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 3/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jill Cakebread et al v. Berkeley Millwork and Furniture Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cakebread
Represented By: Ethan Clark Forrest
Represented By: Clara J. Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Cakebread
Represented By: Ethan Clark Forrest
Represented By: Clara J. Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Millwork and Furniture Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?