Fitbit Inc. v. AliphCom et al.

Plaintiff: Fitbit Inc
Defendant: Aliphcom and BodyMedia Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00118
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2017 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 131 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE MARKMAN TUTORIAL AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/24/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 108 PLAINTIFF FITBIT, INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/24/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
June 26, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 108 PLAINTIFF FITBIT, INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
March 20, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 106 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS ALIPHCOM D/B/A JAWBONE AND BODYMEDIA, INC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/20/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 2, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 74 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
January 25, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 96 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
October 31, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 65 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/31/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
May 19, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 60 Case Management Conference - Initial, Claims Tutorial set for 02/03/2017 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/10/2017 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/19/2016. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
January 25, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Dkt. No. 44 in 5:15-cv-04073-EJD). The court has reviewed the motion and determined that the cases are not related and that no reassignments shall occur. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/25/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitbit Inc. v. AliphCom et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitbit Inc
Represented By: Wayne M. Barsky
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Frederick S. Chung
Represented By: Yu-Chieh Ernest Hsin
Represented By: Neema Jalali
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: Jason C Lo
Represented By: Mark Nolan Reiter
Represented By: Jennifer J. Rho
Represented By: R Scott Roe
Represented By: Stuart Mattison Rosenberg
Represented By: Paul Saindon
Represented By: Zachary J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliphcom
Represented By: Elisha Barron
Represented By: E. Lindsay Calkins
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph S. Grinstein
Represented By: Edgar G. Sargent
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Max L. Tribble
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodyMedia Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?