Fields v. Twitter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tamara Fields
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00213
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2016 Filing 32 REPLY (re 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Carome, Patrick) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE (re 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint ) filed byHeather Creach, Tamara Fields, J.C. (1), a minor, J.C. (2), a minor. (Bursor, Scott) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/20/2016. Replies due by 4/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Waxman, Seth) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Twitter, Inc.. Filed byTamara Fields, Heather Creach, J.C. (2), a minor, J.C. (1), a minor. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
January 13, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Twitter, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-10131849). Filed by Tamara Fields. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/13/2016) Modified on 1/13/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Fields
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Represented By: Mark D. Flanagan
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?