Vickers v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cleveland Vickers
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. and J.C. Penney Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00256
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying 42 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
September 16, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/16/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
June 27, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Inspection. Motion Hearing re: 18 MOTION regarding Plaintiff's Request for Administrative Relief from the Court's Order regarding the Site Inspection required under General Order 56 and the Scheduling Order and that the C ourt issue an Order to Show Cause re Defendants' set for 6/29/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/27/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
May 2, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 14 Stipulation Re Joint Inspection. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickers v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Vickers
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?