Elder v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elder and Timothy Elder
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc. and Premier Getaway, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00278
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E Henderson
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
2 Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 161 Statement re #158 MOTION for Attorney Fees Non-Opposition by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Case division and case location information are incorrect. The correct information, per the ECF notification sent August 21, 2019, i s Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:16-cv-00278 JST. Re: #160 Statement filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 160 Statement re #158 MOTION for Attorney Fees Non-Opposition by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 159 Statement of Non-Opposition re #158 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byBlackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #158 ) (Hoffman, Jason) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Timothy Elder. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/11/2020. Replies due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #2 Declaration of Jana Eisinger, #3 Proposed Order)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 156 Declaration of Stephanie J. Fiereck, Esq. in Support of #150 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) (Declaration Re CAFA Notice) filed byTimothy Elder. (Related document(s) #150 ) (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 155 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher in Support of #154 Supplemental Brief (Amended) filed byTimothy Elder. (Related document(s) #154 ) (Fisher, L) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Location code is incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct location code, 4, on future filings. Re: #154 Supplem ental Brief filed by Timothy Elder (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 154 Supplemental Brief re #153 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed byTimothy Elder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher)(Related document(s) #153 ) (Fisher, L) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re #150 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed by Timothy Elder. Status Report due by 1/19/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 23, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #150 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed by Timothy Elder. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 15, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 151 Consent MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the October 23, 2019 Motion Hearing filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Jason) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 150 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed by Timothy Elder. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/25/2019. Replies due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #2 Declaration of Jana Eisinger, #3 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari, Esq., #4 Declaration of Cori Parnes, #5 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 149 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #148***CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019) Modified on 8/22/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2019 Filing 148 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re 146 Case Management Conference - Further. Letter Brief due by 8/28/2019. Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 14, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 146 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2019. Parties appeared telephonically. Parties are to meet and confer regarding discovery. Referral order to issue. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: L. Timothy Fisher, Jana Eisinger. Defendant Attorney: Angela Agrusa and David Farkas - Hilton, Jason Hoffman - Blackhawk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #144 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 144 Consent MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the August 14, 2019 Case Management Conference filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Jason) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 143 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER APPROVING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 141 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Request to Appear Telephonically at the August 14, 2019 Case Management Conference filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 139 Updated Statement Regarding Status of Confirmatory Discovery (Updated) filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 138 Statement Regarding Status of Confirmatory Discovery filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE by Timothy Elder of Resolution of En Banc Review in In Re Hyundai & Kia Fuel Econ. Litig. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER STAYING CONSIDERATION OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL AND ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING MOTION re #130 MOTION for Settlement filed by Timothy Elder. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE by Timothy Elder of Resolution of Petition for En Banc Review in In Re Hyundai & Kia Fuel Econ. Litig. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice #118 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER STAYING CONSIDERATION OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2018. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #130 MOTION for Settlement filed by Timothy Elder. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2018. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action for Settlement filed by Timothy Elder. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/30/2018. Replies due by 5/7/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher (Redacted), #(2) Declaration of Jana Eisinger, #(3) Declaration of Cori Parnes, #(4) Declaration of Mark A. Fellows, #(5) [Proposed] Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Timothy Elder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted- Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, #4 Redacted - Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, #5 Confidential- Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, #6 Confidential- Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE filed by Timothy Elder re #125 Stipulation and Order Re Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS re #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 126 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. The hearing scheduled for 5/24/2018 on the pending #63 MOTION to Dismiss, is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 124 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 123 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss is continued from 3/22/2018 to 5/24/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 122 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/5/2018) Modified on 3/6/2018 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2018 Filing 121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 2/8/2018. Case settled. Settlement reached in principle. Parties to draft Settlement AgreementFTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: L. Timothy Fisher. Defendant Attorney: Angela Agrusa - Dft Hilton; Jason Hoffman - Dft Blackhawk. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 120 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Against Premier Getaways, Inc. filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 119 REPLY (re #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byBlackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 118 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Exhibit 1)(Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair E. Reed (Reed, Blair) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 116 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE JON S. TIGAR. The telephonic case management conference set for 2/23/2018 and case management conference statement due date of 2/21/2018 are vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 115 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/25/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephone Scheduling Conference to set settlement conference held on 1/25/2018. Settlement conference set for 2/8/18 at 9:30 AM. All parties shall attend in person, except Defendants Premier Getaways & Blackhawk will attend by phone. Court to issue Order.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Tim Fisher, Jana Eisinger. Defendant Attorney: Angela Agrua - Dft Hilton; Jason Hoffman - Dft Blackhawk; Zana Bugaighis - Dft Premier Getaway. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. The Motion Hearing currently set for 2/22/2018 is continued to 3/22/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. No other deadlines are changed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #106 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/2/2018. Replies due by 2/16/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2018 AT 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #110 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendant Premier's Motion to Dismiss filed by Timothy Elder. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 25, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRENDAN T. MANGAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #109 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 110 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendant Premier's Motion to Dismiss filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice re Brendan T. Mangan, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12011911), (Filing Fee Previously Paid on 01/10/2018) filed by Premier Getaway, Inc.. (Mangan, Brendan) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas Freed (Freed, John) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 15, 2018 Filing 107 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Premier Getaway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Bugaighis, Zana) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying #103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Brendan T. Mangan for failure to comply with Civil Local Rule 11-3(a)(3). Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference to set Settlement Conference has been re-set for 1/25/2018 09:00 AM in Chambers-SF before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice re Brendan T. Mangan, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12011911) filed by Premier Getaway, Inc.. (Mangan, Brendan) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE : Telephone Conference to set Settlement Conference has been set for 1/23/2018 09:00 AM in Chambers-SF before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 4, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 12/15/2017. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2018. Telephone Conference set for 2/23/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Class certification expert disclosures 3/30/2018. Class certification expert rebuttal 4/13/2018. Class certification expert discovery cut-off 4/27/2018. Class certification motion due 5/9/2018. Class certification opposition due 6/9/2018. Class certification reply due 7/8/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 3, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Requesting Referral to a Settlement Conference Pursuant to ADR L.R. 7-2 filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 24, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/15/2018. Replies due by 1/30/2018. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 98 AMENDED NOTICE filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc. re #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE of Change of Address by Angela Christine Agrusa - Notice of Change of Firm Address (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2017. Total Time in Court: 22 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2017)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re #94 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Permission to Allow Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. and Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc. to Appear Telephonically filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Permission to Allow Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. and Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc. to Appear Telephonically filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Permission to Allow Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. and Hilton Grand Vacations Company,Inc. to Appear Telephonically)(Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 12/12/2017) Modified on 12/12/2017 (tnS, ).
December 6, 2017 Filing 93 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple callers in to the 12/13/2017 case management conference. Not less than 24 hours prior to the conference, the parties appearing by telephone shall email to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk (jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) one number at which all attorneys they can be reached. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #90 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #89 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Premier Getaway, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Bugaighis, Zana) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 88 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 86 RESPONSE to the Court's October 10, 2017 Order Regarding Motion for Preliminary Approval re #83 Order filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #84 Joint Stipulation Regarding Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Order Regarding Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 84 Joint Stipulation Regarding Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Order Regarding Preliminary Approval of Settlement re #83 Order filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Farkas, David) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL re #75 MOTION for Settlement filed by Timothy Elder. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #75 MOTION for Settlement filed by Timothy Elder The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, ECF No. 75, suitable for disposition without oral argument pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The motion is deemed under submission as of the date of this order.This is a text only order. There is no document associated with this entry.Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 08/15/2017. (RR, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 8/14/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 18, 2017 Filing 79 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE OF JULY 31, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE THELTON E. HENDERSON. Please be advised that the hearing date of July 31, 2017 for Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement is hereby vacated in light of the upcoming retirement of Judge Henderson and the reassignment of this case upon Judge Henderson's retirement.Following the order of reassignment - Plaintiff's counsel is directed to re-notice their motion before the newly assigned judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 18, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Dashiell Smith (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying #76 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/20/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 76 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement [L.R. 6-2] filed by Timothy Elder. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Timothy Elder. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 6/30/2017. Replies due by 7/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #2 Declaration of Jana Eisinger, #3 Declaration of Mark A. Fellows, #4 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting #73 Stipulation. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 6/16/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 73 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 72 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Motion(s) Hearing(s): The hearing for defendants' motion to dismiss which has been noticed for Monday, June 19, 2017 and the hearing deadline set for plaintiff's class certification motion for Monday, August 21, 2017. In light of the Joint Stipulation Regarding Deadlines in Light of Settlement, the hearing dates for the above motions are hereby VACATED. Counsel are advised that the above motions may be renoticed if necessary.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting #70 Stipulation. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 15, 2017 Filing 70 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Deadlines in Light of Settlement filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order, #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 9, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Opposition due by 5/17/2017. Reply due by 5/24/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 9, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Set/Reset Hearing re #69 Order on Stipulation: Plaintiff's Class Certification Motion due by 6/12/2017. Defendant's opposition due by 7/10/2017. Plaintiff's reply due by 7/31/2017. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 8/21/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES DUE TO SETTLEMENT by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting #68 Stipulation. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 68 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Deadlines Due to Settlement filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Opposition due by 5/17/2017. Reply due by 5/24/2017. Motion Hearing reset to 6/19/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 67 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR BLACKHAWK'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting #66 Stipulation and modifying order to continue the hearing date on the motion to June 19, 2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Blackhawk's Motion to Dismiss filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jason F. Hoffman. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 64 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blackhawk Network Holdings Inc. for Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Timothy Elder's First Amended Complaint filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 5/3/2017. Replies due by 5/10/2017. (Attachments: #(1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11328198) filed by Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Hoffman, Jason) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 61 JOINT STIPULATION To Extend Time for Premier to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Premier Getaway, Inc.. (Bugaighis, Zana) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 5, 2017 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Elder. Premier Getaway, Inc. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
April 5, 2017 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Elder. Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
April 5, 2017 Filing 58 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 57 Summons on First Amended Class Action Complaint Issued as to DefendantsBlackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc. & Premier Getaway, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 56 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 55 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Premier Getaway, Inc., Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.. Filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to, Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Class Certification Motion due by 5/12/2017. Defendant's Opposition due by 6/9/2017. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/30/2017. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 7/24/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 54 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting #53 Stipulation, modifying hearing date to July 24, 2017.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 52 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Farkas, David) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting #45 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint Due by 03/22/17. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Reference and Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re Discovery Procedures, denying without prejudice #48 Discovery Letter Brief. Joint letter due by 3/17/2017.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 9, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/8/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 6, 2017 Filing 48 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY (re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint) filed by Timothy Elder. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 22, 2017 Filing 46 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint) filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 9, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Responses due by 2/22/2017. Replies due by 3/1/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 8, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Timothy Elder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #2 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
October 31, 2016 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/31/2016. Court adopts Plaintiff's proposed schedule for Motion to Certify Class as follows: Motion due by 4/28/2017. Responses due by 5/26/2017. Replies due by 6/23/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Parties may submit letter briefs if they have a discovery dispute. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2017. Total Time in Court 6 minutes. No Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Timothy Fisher. Defendant Attorney David Farkas - by telephone. This is a text only Minute Entry (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 43 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 42 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session by Mediator, John Koeppel; Mediation session was held on 10/19/2016; Case did not settle; Mediation process is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
September 30, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 10/19/2016 at 10:00 AM at the Phillip Burton Federal Building and Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94102. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE filed by Timothy Elder of Notice of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation (Eisinger, Jana) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 9, 2016 Filing 40 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing John Koeppel as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Granting Joint Stipulation re Request for Defendants' Telephonic Appearance in Lieu of Personal Appearance at Further Case Management Conference by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting #37 Stipulation.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 22, 2016 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/22/2016., Case referred to ADR Department for early mediation. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court 7 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney L. Timothy Fisher. Defendant Attorney David Farkas (By Phone). Attachment Civil Pretrial Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Joint Stipulation re Request for Defendants' Telephonic Appearance in Lieu of Personal Appearance at Further Case Management Conference filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 15, 2016 Filing 36 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
June 27, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE by Timothy Elder of Withdrawal of Julia A. Luster as Counsel for Plaintiff (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/23/2016. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court 18 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney L. Timothy Fisher. Defendant Attorney David Farkas (by phone). Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2016)
May 19, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 5/19/2016 with Howard Herman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE REQUEST FOR DEFENDANTS' TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE IN LIEU OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #29 Joint Stipulation, filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/18/2016. ** Counsel directed to contact court clerk for dial-in instructions. ** (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 31 [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation re Request for Defendants' Telephonic Appearance in Lieu of Personal Appearance at Initial Case Management Conference re #29 Joint Stipulation filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #27 Joint Stipulation filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/17/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 29 Joint Stipulation re Request for Defendants' Telephonic Appearance in Lieu of Personal Appearance at Initial Case Management Conference filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 27 Third Joint Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 26 Refund APPROVED re #22 Application for Refund. (tnS) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/26/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 24 Declaration of David B. Farkas in Support of #23 Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Farkas, David) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 20, 2016 Filing 23 Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 19, 2016 Filing 22 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-10189055 by Timothy Elder. (Eisinger, Jana) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 15, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 4/14/2016. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 5/19/2016 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains thes ame (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 6, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Set/Reset Hearing re #21 Order on Joint Stipulation: Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 5/23/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting #19 Joint Stipulation continuing initial case management conference from 4/18/2016 to 5/23/2016 at 1:30 PM.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 20 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 19 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 18 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on April 14, 2016 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Timothy Elder (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 15 Joint Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to re #1 Initial Complaint filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Elder. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. served on 2/10/2016, answer due 3/2/2016. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jana Eisinger (Eisinger, Jana) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Thelton E. Henderson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Henderson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jana Eisinger.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 25PP7QV3), (Filing Fee previously paid on 2/4/16) filed by Timothy Elder. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Eisinger, Jana) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/21/16. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 20, 2016 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Timothy Elder. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 2/2/2016. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-10140847). Filed by Timothy Elder. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elder v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Farkas
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Grand Vacations Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Farkas
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Engagement Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Jason F Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Getaway, Inc.
Represented By: Zana Z Bugaighis
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Brendan T. Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Elder
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Blair E. Reed
Represented By: Julia A. Luster
Represented By: Jana Eisinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?