Parson et al v. Golden State FC, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David Parson, Brandon Mitchell and Mariah Gullat
Defendant: Golden State FC, LLC, Trueblue Inc, SMX and Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00405
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE and [Proposed] ORDER filed by Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
May 2, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
February 16, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Response filed by David Parson, Brandon Mitchell, Mariah Gullat. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parson et al v. Golden State FC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Parson
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: John Thomas Stralen
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mitchell
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: John Thomas Stralen
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Gullat
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: John Thomas Stralen
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State FC, LLC
Represented By: Theresa C. Mak
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Joseph A. Nuccio
Represented By: Richard G. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trueblue Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa C. Mak
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Joseph A. Nuccio
Represented By: Richard G. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?