Celeste Olivarez v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Celeste Olivarez
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc., Veriprise Processing Solutions, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 4:2016cv00410
Filed: January 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE RED-LINE VERSION OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/18/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 1, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Mortgage electronic Registration Systems, INC. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 25, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc. ; Instructions to Counsel.Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 2, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/2/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celeste Olivarez v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Olivarez
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veriprise Processing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?