Deroos v. Ford Motor Company, et al

Plaintiff: Kyle Deroos
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and SJK, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00445
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 28 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 27, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 21 Notice filed by Ford Motor Company]. All deadlines and hearings remain active and in place until a dismissal is filed. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/27/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016) Modified on 4/27/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deroos v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Deroos
Represented By: Jeffrey Le Pere
Represented By: Hallen David Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJK, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?