Barnes v. Energy Recovery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
David Barnes |
Defendant: |
Energy Recovery, Inc., Thomas Rooney and Joel Gay |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00477 |
Filed: |
January 27, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward M. Chen |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 17, 2016 |
Filing
127
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal filed by David Barnes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing
103
Discovery Order. As described in the attached order, the court allows the plaintiff to question Mr. Gay about whether the alleged misrepresentations made by Mr. Rooney factored into his separation from ERI. The discovery is allowed to facilitate t he upcoming mediation on July 28 and (with the parties' agreement) is designated confidential under the protective order absent stipulation of the parties or further order of the court. The court allows some flexibility in questioning but expect s the questioning to be tethered to the representations made to Mr. Barnes before and during his employment at ERI, whether Mr. Rooney made those representations elsewhere (whether to the public or internally in the company), and whether those representations factored into Mr. Rooney's separation from ERI. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing
96
ORDER re 91 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Thomas Rooney, Joel Gay, Energy Recovery, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
|
June 10, 2016 |
Filing
78
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION: Re 77 Notice (Other) filed by Thomas Rooney, Joel Gay, Energy Recovery, Inc. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/10/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
42
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 34 Amended Complaint Modifying Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by Thomas Rooney, Joel Gay, Energy Recovery, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 26 . Deadlines extended re: 14 Motion for Return of Property Modifying Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's Reply due by 3/9/2016. Defendant's Responses due by 3/2/2016. Hearing date is not changed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/25/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?