Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al

Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and XYZ Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00524
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PROVIDING OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF 25 MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation and Disposition of Seized Merchandise. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 16, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/16/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 3, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SEIZURE ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE, AS MODIFIED. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/19/2016 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 1, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 5 Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order and an Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 02/01/2016. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cara R. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?