Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area et al v. Executive Office for Immigration Review et al

Plaintiff: Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto and American Immigration Lawyers Association
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2016cv00544
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, United States Department of Justi ce, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies, Executive Office for Immigration Review, American Immigration Lawyers Association, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/4/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
October 18, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CMC re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request to Vacate Case Management Conference and Extend Date for Responsive Pleading filed by Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Franci sco Bay Area, United States Department of Justice, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies, Executive Office for Immigration Review, American Immigration Lawyers Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/18/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
July 20, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request for Relief from Automatic Referral to ADR; Request to Reset Dates filed by Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, United St ates Department of Justice, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies, Executive Office for Immigration Review, American Immigration Lawyers Association Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Responsive pleading due 08/26/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/20/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
March 25, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Responsive pleading due 05/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 8/2/2016 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/25/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area et al v. Executive Office for Immigration Review et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Christine Louise Lin
Represented By: Ilyce Sue Shugall
Represented By: Travis S Silva
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Gender & Refugee Studies
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Christine Louise Lin
Represented By: Ilyce Sue Shugall
Represented By: Travis S Silva
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Christine Louise Lin
Represented By: Ilyce Sue Shugall
Represented By: Travis S Silva
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Christine Louise Lin
Represented By: Ilyce Sue Shugall
Represented By: Travis S Silva
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?