Aslan v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Jacques Aslan
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2016cv00576
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/13/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
July 27, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 TO EXTEND ADR COMPLETION DATE BY THIRTY DAYS filed by Jacques Aslan. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/27/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
April 4, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, To Extend Time For Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 10, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aslan v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Aslan
Represented By: Mitchell Owen Hefter
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Alan Edward Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?