Weiss v. See's Candy Shops, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Avi Weiss
Defendant: See's Candy Shops, Inc. and See's Candies Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00661
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLIC/REDACTED ORDER Granting 39 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
March 31, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulated Request to Continue Further Case Management Conference and Hearing and Briefing Deadlines on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by See's Candies Inc. Responses due by 5/17/2017. Replies due by 5/31/2017. Motion Hearing and CMC set for 6/22/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 10, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by See's Candies Inc., See's Candy Shops, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
February 22, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference and Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by See's Candies Inc., See's Candy Shops, Inc. Motion Hearing reset for 4/27/2 017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
May 20, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 25 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/18/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss v. See's Candy Shops, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candy Shops, Inc.
Represented By: Neil A. Friedman Popovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candies Inc.
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Neil A. Friedman Popovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avi Weiss
Represented By: Suzanne Havens Beckman
Represented By: Yitzchak Hillel Lieberman
Represented By: Grace E. Parasmo
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?