Luehrs v. Zimmer, Inc., et al.,

Plaintiff: Gerald L. Luehrs
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc. and Gregg T. Pottorff
Case Number: 4:2016cv00690
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed with prejudice as against defendant Zimmer, Inc., the remaining defendant. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 31, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 16, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/16/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
March 3, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT ZIMMER, INC. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 22, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/22/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luehrs v. Zimmer, Inc., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Luehrs
Represented By: Louis James Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lorin Campbell
Represented By: David Stephen Christy
Represented By: Candace Breana Neal
Represented By: Stephanie N. Russo
Represented By: Sonja S. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg T. Pottorff
Represented By: Ronald Paul Goldman
Represented By: Mary Margaret Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?