Jones v. Nutiva, Inc.

Plaintiff: Preston Jones
Defendant: Nutiva, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00711
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 124 Stipulation for Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Plaintiff Preston Jones's Individual Claims Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
October 18, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 86 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 4, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 117 Stipulation Modifying Scheduling Order (Dkt No. 65 ) Relating to the Remaining Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' 102 Motion for Class Certification. Responses due by 12/1/2017; Replies due by 1/12/2018; Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 27, 2017 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 113 Stipulation to Plaintiffs filing Third Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 14, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-17-3374-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 6, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 105 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order (Dkt No. 65 ) Relating to the Remaining Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
August 23, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 74 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 9, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding parties' 96 7/12/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
July 21, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 97 Stipulation re 65 Order on Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order Relating to Deadline to Complete Class Certification Expert Depositions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
June 2, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 88 Stipulation re 86 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Request to Modify Briefing Schedule). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
December 29, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 80 Stipulated Request for Order Modifying Briefing Schedule Relating to Nutiva's 74 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complain. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
November 29, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Stipulation EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
October 11, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding parties' 57 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Requests for Admission. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 7, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 54 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Requests for Production Nos. 22 & 23. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
September 26, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 51 9/16/16 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Interrogatory Nos. 10 & 11. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 23, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 50 Discovery Letter Brief re: Definitions in light of 55 . (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 22, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 18 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, DENYING 19 MOTION TO REMAND, AND DENYING 28 MOTION TO STRIKE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 12, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 45 8/10/16 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
April 26, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 13, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 35 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 24, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Kaiser, Ryan.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Nutiva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Jones
Represented By: John Joseph Fitzgerald, IV
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Joseph
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutiva, Inc.
Represented By: William Paul Cole
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?