Cisneros v. Vangilder et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Cisneros
Defendant: J. Vangilder, J. Vasquez, S. Cupp, J. Cuske, K. Ohland and D. Melton
Case Number: 4:2016cv00735
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: PSLC GRC
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Stipulation re Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. See Amended Complaint at Docket No. 55. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 29, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (docket no. 52 in 4:16-cv-00735-HSG and docket no. 49 in 4:16-cv-01320-HSG) STIPULATION of Case Schedule: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2017; Designation of Experts due by 5/22/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/22/20 18; Dispositive Motion due by 7/23/2018; Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2018 03:00 PM.; Jury Selection/Jury Trial (5-day) set for 11/13/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/29/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
May 16, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/16/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
September 27, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING M 21 OTION TO CONSIDER CASES AS RELATED AND CONSOLIDATE CASES; GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisneros v. Vangilder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vangilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cuske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ohland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?