Knapp v. Art.com, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Prescott Knapp
Defendant: Art.com, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00768
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 49 JOINT STIPULATION RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL - Motions and related deadlines are vacated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/12/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
June 16, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE - Fact Discovery cutoff: 7/7/2017. Dispositive motions to be heard by 9/6/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2017 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 1/8/2018 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 15, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick regarding 19 Motion to Dismiss and Strike. Knapp may file a second amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. If he chooses not to file a second amended complaint, Art.com shall file its answer within 20 days of the date of his notice filed in the Court's docket on ECF that he will not file a second amended complaint, or within 40 days of the date of this Order, whichever is sooner. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
May 24, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2016. Case Management Conference continued to 6/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/24/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 19, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on April 19, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. Art.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Prescott Knapp
Represented By: Kyle Geoffrey Bates
Represented By: Jason H. Kim
Represented By: Todd M. Schneider
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?