Leoncio et al v. Quicken Loans, Inc.

Plaintiff: Benjamin Leoncio and Deborah Leoncio
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00846
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 24, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
June 1, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NON-APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/1/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
March 31, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leoncio et al v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine Elizabeth Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Leoncio
Represented By: Erikson McDonnell Davis
Represented By: Mae-Elaine Ednalaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Leoncio
Represented By: Erikson McDonnell Davis
Represented By: Mae-Elaine Ednalaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?