American Maritime Officers v. American President Lines, LTD. et al

Plaintiff: American Maritime Officers
Defendant: American President Lines, Ltd., APL Maritime, Ltd and International Organization of Masters, Mates, and Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 4:2016cv00861
Filed: February 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 67 RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by American President Lines, Ltd., APL Maritime, Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/25/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
November 16, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 53 Defendant MMP's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
July 26, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 Stipulated Protective Order filed by American Maritime Officers. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
June 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
February 29, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 5 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/29/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Maritime Officers v. American President Lines, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Maritime Officers
Represented By: Tyler Mark Paetkau
Represented By: Olga Savage
Represented By: Jay L Withee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American President Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Paul Edward Goatley
Represented By: Philip Lane Ross
Represented By: John M. Skonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APL Maritime, Ltd
Represented By: Paul Edward Goatley
Represented By: Philip Lane Ross
Represented By: John M. Skonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Organization of Masters, Mates, and Pilots, ILA, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?