Karuk Tribe et al v. Stelle et al

Plaintiff: Karuk Tribe, Environmental Protection Information Center, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Klamath Riverkeeper and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: William Stelle, National Marine Fisheries Service, Patricia A. Grantham and United States Forest Service
Intervenor_dft: Siskiyou County, American Forest Resource Council, Gary Rainey and George Harper
Case Number: 4:2016cv01079
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING INTERVENORS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
May 23, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than May 23, 2017. Defendants shall file an answer to the Second Amended Complaint no later than June 22, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment no later than August 28, 2017. Federal Defendants and Intervenors shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment no later than September 27, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and repl y no later than October 27, 2017. Federal Defendants and Intervenors shall file their reply no later than December 7, 2017. The hearing is continued from October 20, 2017, to January 19, 2018, at 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 15, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs shall file, no later than May 23, 2017, a Second Amended Complaint in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 5, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PARTIES' STIPULATED REQUEST RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
April 26, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST CHANGING TIME TO LODGE AND SERVE THE SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. The deadline for the parties to file a supplemental administrative record, if needed, is extended to 21 days after the Court's ruli ng on plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Within 7 days of such ruling, the parties shall file a stipulation and proposed order as to a revised schedule for briefing summary judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 24, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 10, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CHAMBERS COPY OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs are directed to submit forthwith a chambers copy of the motion in single-sided format. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
February 7, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. A Case Management Conference is set for Friday March 17, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. The Case Management Conference shall be conducted telephonically. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
May 20, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' STIPULATION RE: CASE MANAGEMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 19, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
April 25, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY OF ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Court having considered the parties' respective writt en submissions and the arguments of counsel at the hearing, and for the reasons stated by the Court on the record, the motion for a temporary restraining order and motion for a preliminary injunction are denied. Additionally, plaintiffs' oral motion for a stay of said ruling is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 20, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TRO. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 19, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFERRED PORTION OF STIPULATION. The Stipulation is approved as to the format of the chambers copy of the administrative record, on condition that a paper copy of any document cited in a party's briefing be provided by that party, absent an order from the Court allowing such party to provide an excerpted paper copy in lieu thereof. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 15, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON COMPUTER DISK OR DRIVE; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. With respect to the form of a courtesy copy for chambers, the Court defers ruling, and defendants are directed to file, no late r than April 19, 2016, a brief statement as to the number of pages comprising the administrative record, after which the Court will rule as to the deferred part of the request. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 22, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF LAWSON E. FITE PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karuk Tribe et al v. Stelle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stelle
Represented By: Alison D Garner
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Alison D Garner
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Grantham
Represented By: Alison D Garner
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Alison D Garner
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karuk Tribe
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Represented By: Thomas Edgerton Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klamath Riverkeeper
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Siskiyou County
Represented By: Lawson E. Fite
Represented By: Brian Lee Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: American Forest Resource Council
Represented By: Brian Lee Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Gary Rainey
Represented By: Brian Lee Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: George Harper
Represented By: Brian Lee Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?