November 17, 2017 |
Filing
114
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY CASE PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/17/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
109
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/29/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
|
August 23, 2017 |
Filing
104
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. All presently scheduled summary judgment briefing deadlines are vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
|
June 29, 2017 |
Filing
100
ORDER DIRECTING INTERVENORS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
|
May 23, 2017 |
Filing
96
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than May 23, 2017. Defendants shall file an answer to the Second Amended Complaint no later than June 22, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment no later than August 28, 2017. Federal Defendants and Intervenors shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment no later than September 27, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and repl y no later than October 27, 2017. Federal Defendants and Intervenors shall file their reply no later than December 7, 2017. The hearing is continued from October 20, 2017, to January 19, 2018, at 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
|
May 15, 2017 |
Filing
94
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs shall file, no later than May 23, 2017, a Second Amended Complaint in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
92
ORDER DENYING PARTIES' STIPULATED REQUEST RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing
90
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST CHANGING TIME TO LODGE AND SERVE THE SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. The deadline for the parties to file a supplemental administrative record, if needed, is extended to 21 days after the Court's ruli ng on plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Within 7 days of such ruling, the parties shall file a stipulation and proposed order as to a revised schedule for briefing summary judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
|
April 24, 2017 |
Filing
88
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
83
ORDER RE: CHAMBERS COPY OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs are directed to submit forthwith a chambers copy of the motion in single-sided format. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing
75
ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. A Case Management Conference is set for Friday March 17, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. The Case Management Conference shall be conducted telephonically. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing
71
ORDER APPROVING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' STIPULATION RE: CASE MANAGEMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
|
May 19, 2016 |
Filing
69
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
|
April 25, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY OF ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Court having considered the parties' respective writt en submissions and the arguments of counsel at the hearing, and for the reasons stated by the Court on the record, the motion for a temporary restraining order and motion for a preliminary injunction are denied. Additionally, plaintiffs' oral motion for a stay of said ruling is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
56
ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TRO. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing
47
ORDER RE: DEFERRED PORTION OF STIPULATION. The Stipulation is approved as to the format of the chambers copy of the administrative record, on condition that a paper copy of any document cited in a party's briefing be provided by that party, absent an order from the Court allowing such party to provide an excerpted paper copy in lieu thereof. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
|
April 15, 2016 |
Filing
35
STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON COMPUTER DISK OR DRIVE; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. With respect to the form of a courtesy copy for chambers, the Court defers ruling, and defendants are directed to file, no late r than April 19, 2016, a brief statement as to the number of pages comprising the administrative record, after which the Court will rule as to the deferred part of the request. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF LAWSON E. FITE PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
|