Ferras v. Husqvarna Construction Products North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gary Ferras
Defendant: Husqvarna Construction Products North America, Inc., Husqvarna North America and Husqvarna Group
Case Number: 4:2016cv01081
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra B Armstrong on 11/14/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 30, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE BY THREE WEEKS filed by Gary Ferras. Mediation deadline extended until 10/21/16. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/30/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/30/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
May 27, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 STIPULATION TO CHANGE DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2016. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferras v. Husqvarna Construction Products North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ferras
Represented By: Alan Frederick Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna Construction Products North America, Inc.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Araneda
Represented By: Jason Alex Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?