San Francisco Baykeeper v. Granite Rock Company

Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: Granite Rock Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv01089
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Notice of Settlement & Stipulation to Vacate Time to Respond to Complaint & Case Management Conference filed by Granite Rock Company, San Francisco Baykeeper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/13/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
September 20, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 17 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/20/16. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
July 8, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by Granite Rock Company, San Francisco Baykeeper Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/8/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. Granite Rock Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Rock Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?