Williams v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Darnell C Williams
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2016cv01105
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Darnell C Williams, Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/12/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
April 6, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/5/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 7, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONSENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell C Williams
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?