Kinney v. Marcus et al

Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Defendant: Michele R Clark, David Marcus and Eric Chomsky
Case Number: 4:2016cv01260
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. The following cases are related: C14-2187 LB, C16-1260 LB and C16-2278 HSG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/4/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
June 21, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 30 Motion to Vacate. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 11, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 8 Motion to Transfer Case. The court grants the defendants' motion to transfer and transfers the case to the Central District of California. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Marcus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele R Clark
Represented By: Eric Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marcus
Represented By: Eric Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Chomsky
Represented By: Eric Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?