Crystal Springs Upland School v. FieldTurf USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Crystal Springs Upland School
Defendant: FieldTurf USA, Inc., FieldTurf, Inc. and FieldTurf Tarkett SAS
Case Number: 4:2016cv01335
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
November 7, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywod S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS PARTIAL 11 MOTION TO DISMISS; SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2016.; Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2016; Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2016 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
July 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crystal Springs Upland School v. FieldTurf USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Springs Upland School
Represented By: Peter Frederick Lindborg
Represented By: Irina Mazor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FieldTurf USA, Inc.
Represented By: R. Bryan Martin
Represented By: William Oscar Martin
Represented By: Kristian Bernard Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FieldTurf, Inc.
Represented By: R. Bryan Martin
Represented By: William Oscar Martin
Represented By: Kristian Bernard Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FieldTurf Tarkett SAS
Represented By: R. Bryan Martin
Represented By: William Oscar Martin
Represented By: Kristian Bernard Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?