Jay et al v. Service Employees International Union United Health Care Workers West et al

Plaintiff: Sheila E. Jay and Robin Bongon
Defendant: Service Employees International Union - United Health Care Workers West and International Union of Operating Engineers - Stationary Engineers Local 39
Case Number: 4:2016cv01340
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 82 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
February 22, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 62 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
November 21, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 46 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
August 19, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 9 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
July 27, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/27/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay et al v. Service Employees International Union United Health Care Workers West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila E. Jay
Represented By: Marylon M. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Bongon
Represented By: Marylon M. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union - United Health Care Workers West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers - Stationary Engineers Local 39
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?