Bonner v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ernest Bonner
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC, Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, as Trustee for ARLP Trust 2, Western Progressive, LLC and OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv01363
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/28/16. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 26, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 66 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 20, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/29/2016 08:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/20/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 8, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 58 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
July 25, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONVERTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS INTO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, as Trustee for ARLP Trus t 2, Fay Servicing, LLC, 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/25/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 13, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 48 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
April 15, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 STIPULATION RE HEARING DATES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 13, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint, 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereo f. Responses due by 5/17/2016. Replies due by 4/22/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/13/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 29, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Bonner
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, as Trustee for ARLP Trust 2
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Represented By: Mike Aleali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Mike Aleali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?