Scott Fitzgerald v. Bosco Credit, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Scott Fitzgerald
Defendant: Bosco Credit, LLC, Franklin Credit Management Corporation and T.D. Service Financial Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv01473
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 22 Motion to Dismiss re: Cause of Action 5. Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2016. Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/4/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
July 15, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 20 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part 22 Motion to Dismiss but ordering supplemental briefing on cause of action 5; Supplemental Responses due by July 29, 2016 and Supplemental Replies by August 12, 2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 8, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 7/14/2016 Hearing re: 20 , 22 Motions to Dismiss; Request to appear by telephone denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/8/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 21, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Notice (Other) filed by T.D. Service Financial Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/21/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 25, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 24 Stipulation to Continue Hearings on Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 2, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Fitzgerald v. Bosco Credit, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Fitzgerald
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosco Credit, LLC
Represented By: Abe Gordon Salen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Abe Gordon Salen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Financial Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Dreyfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?