Ali Rankankan v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Ali Rankankan
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A. and MTC Financial Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01694
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero vacating hearing set for June 24, 2016 and granting 17 Motion to Remand. The Court does not reach the remaining pending motions. The Clerk is instructed to remand the case and close the file. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 12, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearings for all pending motions to June 17, 2016 at 9:30 AM. The temporary restraining order remains in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 12, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
April 18, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 5 Stipulation to Extend Date to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/18/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali Rankankan v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rafael Ramon Garcia-Salgado
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Tanya C. McCullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Represented By: Richard Joseph Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Rankankan
Represented By: Thomas Eastridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?