Michael Tomcik et al v. AMAZON.COM, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Michael Tomcik and Connie Tomcik
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, LLC, Amazon.Com, Inc., Cool Stuff Quick, LLC and Thumper Massager, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01704
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 29 STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW CLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
August 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 23 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 4, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
May 17, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Tomcik et al v. AMAZON.COM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tomcik
Represented By: Charles Carroll Kelly, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Tomcik
Represented By: Charles Carroll Kelly, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cool Stuff Quick, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thumper Massager, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?