Adriana Barbor v. Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Adriana Barbor
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv01773
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Ventura
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/15/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 26, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Stipulation to set briefing schedule re 37 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 11/14/2016. Reply due by 12/5/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orr ick. Case Management Conference continued to 12/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/26/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016) Modified on 10/26/2016 to add information regarding CMC (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 STIPULATION To Continue The Initial Case Management Conference and To Allow Plaintiff To File A Third Amended Complaint. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 27, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA TO RESPOND TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
June 10, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Stipulation REGARDING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, RESPONSE THERETO, AND CONTINUATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adriana Barbor v. Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Barbor
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Timothy J. Rozelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?