Linda C. Reed v. Wilmington Trust, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Linda C. Reed
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, N.A., OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC, Western Progressive LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01933
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART 24 Motion to Dismiss and Amended Notice and DENYING AS MOOT 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 3, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 2, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 2, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING IN ABEYANCE 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 3, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Additional Questions for Hearing on 11 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 3, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 2, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING ON 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 2, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 29, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING as to 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 10:00 a.m. 5/2/2016. Replies due by 10:00 a.m. 5/3/2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 20, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda C. Reed v. Wilmington Trust, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Philip Barilovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Philip Barilovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive LLC
Represented By: Philip Barilovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Barilovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda C. Reed
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?