Kinney v. Takeuchi et al

Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Defendant: Tyson Takeuchi and Michele Clark
Case Number: 4:2016cv02018
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 20 Motion to Transfer Case. The court grants the defendants' motion to transfer and transfers this case to the Central District of California. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 4, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES: Re 23 Objection filed by Charles Kinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/4/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 18, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/18/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Takeuchi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Represented By: Charles G. Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Takeuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?