J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Anabo, Jr.

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Artgel Fernando Anabo, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2016cv02062
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/10/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
August 8, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and Order re Motion Procedures, Order to Submit Further Briefing to Support Motion for Default Judgment, ORDER Setting Hearing on 18 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Artgel Fernando Anabo, Jr., individually and d/b/a Lucky Three Seven Restaurant: Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/08/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 2, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/2/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 20, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing the Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
April 27, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Anabo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artgel Fernando Anabo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?