Nadaf-Rahrov v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al

Plaintiff: Enayatollah Nadaf-Rahrov and Forough Nadaf-Rahrov
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2016cv02112
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 46 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Defendants Shellpoint and Bank of New York Mellon. Bank of New York Mellon (a national association) and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (a business entity) terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/26/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
November 23, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying (23) Ex Parte Application in case 3:16-cv-02112-RS; denying (4) Ex Parte Application in case 3:16-cv-06323-RS. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 2, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/22/2016 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/2/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER NEGOTIATIONS AND BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nadaf-Rahrov v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enayatollah Nadaf-Rahrov
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forough Nadaf-Rahrov
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Joel C. Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?