Supply Pro Sorbents, LLC v. RingCentral, Inc.

Plaintiff: Supply Pro Sorbents, LLC
Defendant: RingCentral, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv02113
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 30 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING AS MOOT 31 Motion to Stay. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
July 28, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding One Week Extension of Time to File Reply re 31 Motion to Stay or Dismiss this Action Pursuant to the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine,. Responses due by 8/5/2016. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/28/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016) Modified on 7/28/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 STIPULATION for Modification of Briefing Schedule as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint for Damages in its Entirety. Responses due by 8/19/2016. Replies due by 9/19/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 6, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 3, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/3/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supply Pro Sorbents, LLC v. RingCentral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supply Pro Sorbents, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Andrew Bock
Represented By: Denise Lissette Diaz
Represented By: Tod Allen Lewis
Represented By: David Max Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RingCentral, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann L. Wymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?