Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Gina McCarthy et al

Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Bay.org and Defenders of Wildlife
Defendant: Gina McCarthy and Jared Blumenfeld
Intervenor_dft: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Case Number: 4:2016cv02184
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 87 Motion to Stay. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
May 30, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DEADLINE BY TWO WEEKS filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Bay.org, Defenders of Wildlife. Dispositive Motion due 6/13/2017. Responses due 7/13/2017. Replies due 8/3/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 29, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
February 7, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 38 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
November 3, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 45 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
September 20, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 48 for two-day extension of time (until Sept. 21, 2016) to file Reply filed by Gina McCarthy, Jared Blumenfeld. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
July 26, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ENLARGE TIME re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Juri sdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Bay.org, Defenders of Wildlife. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 18, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 10 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 27, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Westlands Water District, San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by Gina McCarthy, Jared Blumenfeld. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Gina McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Anthony J LoPresti
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay.org
Represented By: J McCrystie Adams
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: J McCrystie Adams
Represented By: Katherine Scott Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Blumenfeld
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?