Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC

Plaintiff: Michael Edenborough
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv02233
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING MOTIONS ON SHORTENED TIME filed by Michael Edenborough. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
February 27, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re: Stay of Proceedings filed by Michael Edenborough. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
January 24, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR STAY re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Notice of Settlement and Stipulated Request for Stay filed by Michael Edenborough. Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
November 3, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Michael Edenborough filed by Michael Edenborough. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 24, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
July 28, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by ADT, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 14, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by ADT, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 8, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROTECTIVE ORDER re 33 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Michael Edenborough. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Weinstein Bacon
Represented By: Mark Leslie Levine
Represented By: Daniel Ryan McElroy
Represented By: Charles Sanders McNew
Represented By: Katherine A Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edenborough
Represented By: Mark Andrew Chavez
Represented By: Dan Leo Gildor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?