J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Krouse et al

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Joseph Krouse and Divisadero 500, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv02281
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Alsup finding as moot 15 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 18 Stipulation selecting Mediation; granting 27 Stipulation. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 18, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 15 MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Complaint Defendants' Affirmative Defenses. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/18/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
May 24, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Krouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Joseph Krouse
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divisadero 500, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?