Romero et al v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Efren T. Romero and Janeth M. Romero
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and Old Republic Default Management Services, A Division of Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, as Trustee
Case Number: 4:2016cv02286
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 4, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 4, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 26, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 14, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF JANETH M. ROMERO TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS; ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NO BE IMPOSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than September 28, 2016, why the Court should not impose sanctions on plaintiff and/or her counsel. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 14, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
July 20, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING OLD REPUBLIC'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND. Should plaintiff wish to file an amended complaint, plaintiff shall file it no later than August 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 18, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT OLD REPUBLIC'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The July 22, 2016, hearing on Old Republic's motion to dismiss is vacated. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 29, 2016, to October 21, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 7, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 26, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 26, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 6, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 6, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero et al v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren T. Romero
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeth M. Romero
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Myles Alexander Lanzone
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Default Management Services, A Division of Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, as Trustee
Represented By: Mike Aleali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?