Velasquez v. Ndoh

Petitioner: Edgar Enrique Velasquez
Respondent: Rosemary Ndoh
Case Number: 4:2016cv02666
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
October 19, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
September 20, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
June 27, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Clerk of the Court shall serve a Magistrate Judge jurisdiction consent form, a copy of this Order, as well as the petition and all attachments thereto upon Respondent and Respondent's attorney, the Attorney General of the State of California. Defendant's consent or declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge due by 7/25/2016. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 8/26/2016. S igned by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/27/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Ndoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edgar Enrique Velasquez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rosemary Ndoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?