Dunn v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Plaintiff: Elaine Dunn
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Case Number: 4:2016cv02771
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/6/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/23/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 26 by the Parties re Standard of Review Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Mediation Deadline by Thirty (30) Days. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/5/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Dunn
Represented By: Carrie Joanna Feit
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?