Marcus v. City of Richmond et al

Plaintiff: George Marcus
Defendant: City of Richmond, Christopher Magnus, Kaiser Permanente Medical Center, Dr. Bilhartz M.D., Dr. Brown M.D., Dr. Diston, M.D. and David Newdorf, Esq.
Case Number: 4:2016cv02871
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/18/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
August 8, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
September 23, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. The action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/23/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 2, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing, no later than September 14, 2016, why the action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/02/2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 24, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than August 31, 2016, why sanctions should not be imposed for plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
August 15, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 15, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 19, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF RICHMOND'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND. The above-titled action is dismissed as against the City of Richmond with leave to amend on or before August 5, 2016. If plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, the above-titled action will proceed only as against the other named defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 1, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JULY 8, 2016 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 17, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus v. City of Richmond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Represented By: Madelyn G. Jordan-Davis
Represented By: C. Christine Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bilhartz M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Brown M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Diston, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Newdorf, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Marcus
Represented By: Peter Henry Bonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?