Guerrero-Hernandez v. Ozburn-Hessey Logistics, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Valeria Guerrero-Hernandez
Defendant: Ozburn-Hessey Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv02999
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER ACTION AND WAIVE LOCAL RULE 23-3 by Hon. William Alsup granting 21 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 13, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 8, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero-Hernandez v. Ozburn-Hessey Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria Guerrero-Hernandez
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozburn-Hessey Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Catherine Jean Coble
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Tochner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?