Ryan v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Gary Ryan
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2016cv03410
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER as to EAJA Fees. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 18, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY REMAND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
November 23, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ryan
Represented By: Stuart Barasch
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Marcelo N Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?