Harrison Benjamin Kinney v. Gavs Auto Service et al

Plaintiff: Harrison Benjamin Kinney
Defendant: Gavs Auto Service, Joan I. Borgwardt and KGA Business Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv03480
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
November 29, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND EXTENDING INSPECTION DEADLINE re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction; 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to Complete the G.O. 56 Inspection filed by Harrison Benjamin Kinney. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
October 4, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re Case No. 15-cv-3468. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/04/2016. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison Benjamin Kinney v. Gavs Auto Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Benjamin Kinney
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavs Auto Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan I. Borgwardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KGA Business Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?