Lewis et al v. Silvertree Mohave Homeowners' Association, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Domenica Lewis, Jerrold Lewis, S. L., E. L. and Project Sentinel
Defendant: Silvertree Mohave Homeowners' Association, Inc., Carol Lee Adams, Marilyn Black, Anand Bhaskaran, Tamela Durant and Donald W Murphy
Case Number: 4:2016cv03581
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE re 88 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Domenica Lewis, Jerrold Lewis, Project Sentinel, S. L., E. L.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7//14/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 15, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re 83 Statement filed by Domenica Lewis, Jerrold Lewis, Project Sentinel, S. L., E. L. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/15/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
April 26, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, SETTING NEW SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING, AND AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Motions due by 5/18/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/26/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
March 24, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting 49 Motion.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 1, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/1/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
August 3, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 11, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 5, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/5/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Silvertree Mohave Homeowners' Association, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvertree Mohave Homeowners' Association, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Renee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Lee Adams
Represented By: Lisa Renee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Black
Represented By: Lisa Renee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Bhaskaran
Represented By: Lisa Renee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamela Durant
Represented By: Lisa Renee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W Murphy
Represented By: Lisa Renee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenica Lewis
Represented By: Corey David Attaway
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Constance Faye Ramos
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrold Lewis
Represented By: Corey David Attaway
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Constance Faye Ramos
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. L.
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Constance Faye Ramos
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. L.
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Constance Faye Ramos
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Sentinel
Represented By: Corey David Attaway
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Constance Faye Ramos
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?